|
04/26/2011
|
File Number 620
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
House Calendar Number 367
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/14
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|