|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Public Act 11-115
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 533
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
File Number 319
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
House Calendar Number 192
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|