|
06/04/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 645
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8130
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
File Number 757
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
House Calendar Number 454
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/15
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|