|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Public Act 11-117
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
File Number 827
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 532
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6454
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
File Number 88
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
House Calendar Number 70
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/24
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|