05/20/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 538 | |||
05/20/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/18/2011 | House Passed | |||
05/11/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/11/2011 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
05/11/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/11/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/04/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/28/2011 | File Number 651 | |||
04/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 380 | |||
04/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/07/2011 | Public Hearing 04/12 | |||
02/14/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |