|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Public Act 11-252
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 650
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 7586
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5923
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
File Number 678
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
House Calendar Number 414
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/09
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|