05/18/2011 | File Number 807 | |||
05/18/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/18/2011 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/18/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/12/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/17/11 5:00 PM | |||
05/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/09/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
05/04/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/26/2011 | File Number 621 | |||
04/26/2011 | House Calendar Number 368 | |||
04/26/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/18/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 10:00 AM | |||
04/06/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/16/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/14/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |