05/10/2011 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
05/10/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/10/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/09/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/09/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/04/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/26/2011 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/29/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/24/2011 | File Number 195 | |||
03/24/2011 | House Calendar Number 131 | |||
03/24/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/18/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/24/2011 | Public Hearing 03/03 | |||
02/14/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |