Connecticut 2011 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06352 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2011

Chaptered

Bill June 21, 2011

Comm Sub

Bill April 19, 2011
Bill April 5, 2011
Bill March 9, 2011