03/18/2011 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/18/2011 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/17/2011 | Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/10/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education | |||
03/09/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education | |||
03/08/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/04/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/03/2011 | Joint Favorable ED | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |