05/16/2011 | Motion Failed JFS | |||
05/10/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
05/05/2011 | File Number 761 | |||
05/05/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/05/2011 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/05/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/29/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/26/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/29/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/21/2011 | File Number 103 | |||
03/21/2011 | House Calendar Number 83 | |||
03/21/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/14/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |