05/10/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Transportation | |||
04/28/2011 | File Number 652 | |||
04/28/2011 | House Calendar Number 381 | |||
04/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/28/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/14/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/14/2011 | Public Hearing 03/18 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |