03/29/2011 | File Number 277 | |||
03/29/2011 | House Calendar Number 174 | |||
03/29/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/29/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/14/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/11/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/04/2011 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |