05/24/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/20/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/18/2011 | Public Act 11-10 | |||
05/11/2011 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/11/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/11/2011 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |||
03/18/2011 | File Number 90 | |||
03/18/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 104 | |||
03/18/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/16/2011 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
03/16/2011 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4755 | |||
03/07/2011 | File Number 38 | |||
03/07/2011 | House Calendar Number 44 | |||
03/07/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/07/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/28/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/25/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/25/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/17/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |