05/10/2011 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
05/10/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/10/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/09/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/09/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/04/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/26/2011 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/16/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/07/2011 | File Number 39 | |||
03/07/2011 | House Calendar Number 45 | |||
03/07/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
02/28/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/17/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |