06/03/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/31/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/25/2011 | Public Act 11-40 | |||
05/20/2011 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/20/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/14/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 330 | |||
04/14/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/13/2011 | House Passed | |||
03/21/2011 | File Number 105 | |||
03/21/2011 | House Calendar Number 85 | |||
03/21/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/21/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/14/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/07/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/07/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/25/2011 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | |||
02/17/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |