05/03/2011 | File Number 737 | |||
05/03/2011 | House Calendar Number 451 | |||
05/03/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/03/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/29/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/25/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/21/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/29/2011 | Public Hearing 04/11 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |