03/31/2011 | File Number 320 | |||
03/31/2011 | House Calendar Number 193 | |||
03/31/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/31/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/25/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/17/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/17/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |