|
06/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Public Act 11-43
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule J 6869
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule I 6926
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule H 6980
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule G 6927
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 6937
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 6888
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 6897
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 6930
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 6896
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 6895
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 506
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule D 5939
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 5868
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 5893
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 6226
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
File Number 352
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
House Calendar Number 207
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|