05/11/2011 | File Number 789 | |||
05/11/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/11/2011 | New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/11/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/05/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/26/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/26/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/14/2011 | File Number 536 | |||
04/14/2011 | House Calendar Number 321 | |||
04/14/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/08/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/30/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/10/2011 | Public Hearing 03/14 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |