04/19/2011 | File Number 583 | |||
04/19/2011 | House Calendar Number 349 | |||
04/19/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/19/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/07/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/07/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/10/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/09/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/07/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |