05/11/2011 | File Number 782 | |||
05/11/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/11/2011 | New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
05/11/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/05/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/25/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/21/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/12/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/06/2011 | File Number 396 | |||
04/06/2011 | House Calendar Number 253 | |||
04/06/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/31/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/18/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/24/2011 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation |