05/10/2011 | File Number 780 | |||
05/10/2011 | House Calendar Number 470 | |||
05/10/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/10/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/04/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/09/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/26/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/25/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/11/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/11/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/08/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |