04/21/2011 | Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/21/2011 | Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/21/2011 | Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/29/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/23/2011 | File Number 185 | |||
03/23/2011 | House Calendar Number 122 | |||
03/23/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/23/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/09/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/08/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |