Connecticut 2011 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06398 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/23/2011

                            General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 6398
January Session, 2011  *_____HB06398CE____030911____*

General Assembly

Substitute Bill No. 6398 

January Session, 2011

*_____HB06398CE____030911____*

AN ACT CONCERNING PERFORMANCE-BASED TOURISM MARKETING. 

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:

Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2011) (a) As used in this section: 

(1) "Commission" means the Connecticut Commission on Culture and Tourism; 

(2) "Executive director" means the executive director of the Connecticut Commission on Culture and Tourism appointed pursuant to section 10-393 of the general statutes; and

(3) "Regional tourism district" means any regional tourism district established pursuant to section 10-397 of the general statutes.

(b) The commission shall administer a regional tourism marketing grant program to provide grants to each regional tourism district for the purpose of tourism marketing projects and activities. To be eligible for a grant pursuant to this section, a regional tourism district shall raise matching funds from private sources. Grants shall be made from the tourism supplemental revenue account established pursuant to section 2 of this act. 

(c) The commission may adopt regulations, in accordance with the provisions of chapter 54 of the general statutes, to implement the provisions of this section.

Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2011) There is established an account to be known as the "tourism supplemental revenue account" which shall be a separate, nonlapsing account within the General Fund. The account shall contain any moneys required by law to be deposited in the account. Moneys in the account shall be expended by the Commission on Culture and Tourism for the purpose of providing marketing grants to the state's tourism districts, defined in section 10-397 of the general statutes, pursuant to section 1 of this act.

Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2011) If, during the fiscal years ending June 30, 2012, to June 30, 2015, inclusive, the sales tax revenue collected by the Commissioner of Revenue Services from businesses in Standard Industry Classification Codes (1) 5811, eating places only; (2) 5812, eating and drinking places; (3) 5813, drinking places—alcoholic beverages; (4) 7010, hotels, motels and tourist courts; (5) 7020, rooming and boarding houses; (6) 7030, camps and trailer parks; (7) 7033, trailering parks and campsites; (8) 7041, organization hotels and lodging house; (9) 7920, producers, orchestras and entertainers; (10) 7940, commercial sports; (11) 7990, miscellaneous amusement and recreation; (12) 7991, boat and canoe rentals; (13) 7992, public golf courses and swimming pools; (14) 7996, amusement parks; (15) 7998, tourist attraction; (16) 7999, amusement not elsewhere classified; and (17) 8420, botanical and zoological gardens exceeds the amount collected during the fiscal year ending June 30, 2011, by more than three per cent, the commissioner shall segregate the amounts collected beyond such three per cent and transfer such amounts to the tourism supplemental revenue account established pursuant to section 2 of this act. The amount segregated pursuant to this section shall not exceed three million dollars during any fiscal year.

 


This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
Section 1 July 1, 2011 New section
Sec. 2 July 1, 2011 New section
Sec. 3 July 1, 2011 New section

This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:

Section 1

July 1, 2011

New section

Sec. 2

July 1, 2011

New section

Sec. 3

July 1, 2011

New section

 

CE Joint Favorable Subst.

CE

Joint Favorable Subst.