05/10/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/10/2011 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
05/10/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/09/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/09/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/04/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/24/2011 | File Number 196 | |||
03/24/2011 | House Calendar Number 132 | |||
03/24/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/18/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/08/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |