04/04/2011 | File Number 353 | |||
04/04/2011 | House Calendar Number 208 | |||
04/04/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/04/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/28/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/18/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/17/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |