03/22/2011 | File Number 144 | |||
03/22/2011 | House Calendar Number 97 | |||
03/22/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/22/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/10/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |