|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Public Act 11-124
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 552
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Housing
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Housing
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
File Number 247
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
House Calendar Number 158
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|