|
06/03/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Public Act 11-41
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
File Number 676
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 420
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5336
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
File Number 321
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
House Calendar Number 194
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|