07/08/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/24/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/21/2011 | Public Act 11-125 | |||
06/07/2011 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
06/07/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/19/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 512 | |||
05/19/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/17/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/17/2011 | House Passed | |||
04/13/2011 | File Number 521 | |||
04/13/2011 | House Calendar Number 314 | |||
04/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/13/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/07/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/28/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/25/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/24/2011 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |