05/03/2011 | File Number 708 | |||
05/03/2011 | House Calendar Number 430 | |||
05/03/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/03/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/15/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/28/2011 | Public Hearing 04/01 | |||
02/18/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |