06/08/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 664 | |||
06/08/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
06/08/2011 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |||
06/08/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
06/08/2011 | House Passed | |||
04/27/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2011 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/27/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/22/2011 | File Number 146 | |||
03/22/2011 | House Calendar Number 99 | |||
03/22/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/16/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/08/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/03 | |||
02/18/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |