07/08/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/24/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/21/2011 | Public Act 11-126 | |||
06/07/2011 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
06/07/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/23/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 551 | |||
05/23/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/19/2011 | House Passed | |||
04/04/2011 | File Number 355 | |||
04/04/2011 | House Calendar Number 210 | |||
04/04/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/04/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/28/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/18/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/17/2011 | Joint Favorable FL | |||
02/24/2011 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/23/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |