|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Public Act 11-127
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
File Number 863
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 573
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7288
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
File Number 106
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
House Calendar Number 86
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/02/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|