|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Public Act 11-128
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
File Number 872
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 602
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 7599
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6971
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
File Number 616
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
House Calendar Number 362
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/15/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|