05/24/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/24/2011 | No New File by Committee on Human Services | |||
05/24/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/24/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/24/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/17/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Human Services | |||
05/03/2011 | File Number 704 | |||
05/03/2011 | House Calendar Number 431 | |||
05/03/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/26/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/14/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/24/2011 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/23/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |