|
05/24/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Public Act 11-22
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
File Number 541
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 328
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5282
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
File Number 199
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
House Calendar Number 135
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|