03/23/2011 | File Number 188 | |||
03/23/2011 | House Calendar Number 125 | |||
03/23/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/23/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/10/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/04/2011 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |||
02/23/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |