|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Public Act 11-255
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 660
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7608
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
File Number 625
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
House Calendar Number 369
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/06/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/28
|
|
|
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Transportation
|
|
|