|
05/31/2011
|
File Number 864
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 575
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5856
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
File Number 356
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
House Calendar Number 211
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Human Services
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|