Connecticut 2011 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06456 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 General Assembly Raised Bill No. 6456
22 January Session, 2011 LCO No. 3626
3- *_____HB06456CE_FIN030911____*
3+ *03626_______CE_*
44 Referred to Committee on Commerce
55 Introduced by:
66 (CE)
77
88 General Assembly
99
1010 Raised Bill No. 6456
1111
1212 January Session, 2011
1313
1414 LCO No. 3626
1515
16-*_____HB06456CE_FIN030911____*
16+*03626_______CE_*
1717
1818 Referred to Committee on Commerce
1919
2020 Introduced by:
2121
2222 (CE)
2323
2424 AN ACT ESTABLISHING A LEARN HERE, LIVE HERE PROGRAM.
2525
2626 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General Assembly convened:
2727
2828 Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2011) (a) The Commissioner of Economic and Community Development, in consultation with the Commissioner of Revenue Services, shall establish the Learn Here, Live Here program. Such program shall provide incentive for graduates of a public or independent institution of higher education in this state or from a regional vocational-technical school to buy their first homes in the state by allowing persons who graduate on or after January 1, 2013, from such institutions or schools to have a portion of their income tax liability segregated into the Connecticut First-Time Homebuyers Fund established pursuant to section 2 of this act. After a period not exceeding ten years after graduation, any amounts so segregated by a graduate may be withdrawn for the purchase of a first home in the state. The Commissioner of Economic and Community Development shall make payments in accordance with this section from said fund to graduate.
2929
3030 (b) On or before January 1, 2012, the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development, in consultation with the Commissioner of Revenue Services, shall adopt regulations, in accordance with chapter 54 of the general statutes, to carry out the provisions of this section. Said regulations shall include, but not be limited to, (1) a cap on segregated funds for the first year of participation of five per cent of a participating graduates' income tax liability, (2) a cap on segregated funds that increases during years two through ten of such participation, and (3) criteria for such increase.
3131
3232 (c) On or before December 1, 2012, the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development shall develop, within available appropriations, a comprehensive public education program to educate recent graduates of a public or independent institution of higher education in the state or of a regional vocational-technical high school about the program established under this section for first-time home buyers. The public education program shall include, but not be limited to, information concerning life-time savings plans and information on the purchase of a house. The department shall begin to implement the outreach program not later than January 1, 2013.
3333
3434 Sec. 2. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2011) There is established a Connecticut First-Time Homebuyers Fund which shall be a separate, nonlapsing account within the General Fund. Funds segregated by the Commissioner of Revenue Services, pursuant to section 1 of this act, shall be deposited in the account. Amounts deposited in the account shall be available to the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development for payments to participants in the program established pursuant to section 1 of this act. The State Treasurer shall invest the proceeds of the account, and investment earnings shall be credited to and become part of the account. On or before September 1, 2013, and annually thereafter, the State Treasurer shall notify the Commissioner of Economic and Community Development of the total amount in the account. Any funds segregated for a participant in the program established pursuant to section 1 of this act that are not used for the purchase of a first home shall be transferred to the General Fund. Any costs incurred by the State Treasurer in administering the fund shall be paid from investment interest accrued by the principal contributions to the fund.
3535
3636 Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2011) As part of the Live Here, Learn Here program established pursuant to section 1 of this act, the Commissioner of Revenue Services shall segregate a portion of the income taxes paid by a person who graduated from a public or independent institution of higher education in this state or from a regional vocational-technical school during each of the ten taxable years following the year of graduation. Upon the request of such person, the commissioner shall segregate an annual amount determined in accordance with subsection (b) of section 1 of this act. Taxes may be segregated pursuant to this section for taxable years commencing on or after January 1, 2013. The commissioner shall deposit amounts segregated from income tax payments pursuant to this section in the Connecticut First-Time Homebuyers Fund established pursuant to section 2 of this act.
3737
3838 Sec. 4. Subsection (a) of section 32-1m of the general statutes is amended by adding subdivision (23) as follows (Effective January 1, 2013):
3939
4040 (NEW) (23) With regard to the Learn Here, Live Here program established pursuant to section 1 of this act, a summary of the program, including, but not limited to, participation, account totals and disbursements, and recommendations for program changes or legislative changes.
4141
4242
4343
4444
4545 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
4646 Section 1 July 1, 2011 New section
4747 Sec. 2 July 1, 2011 New section
4848 Sec. 3 July 1, 2011 New section
4949 Sec. 4 January 1, 2013 32-1m(a)
5050
5151 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following sections:
5252
5353 Section 1
5454
5555 July 1, 2011
5656
5757 New section
5858
5959 Sec. 2
6060
6161 July 1, 2011
6262
6363 New section
6464
6565 Sec. 3
6666
6767 July 1, 2011
6868
6969 New section
7070
7171 Sec. 4
7272
7373 January 1, 2013
7474
7575 32-1m(a)
7676
77+Statement of Purpose:
7778
79+To establish the Learn Here, Live Here program and create the First-Time Homebuyers Fund to offer residents an affordable housing program that helps first-time homebuyers, promotes college education and addresses the ongoing problem of young people leaving the state after graduation.
7880
79-CE Joint Favorable C/R FIN
80-
81-CE
82-
83-Joint Favorable C/R
84-
85-FIN
81+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not underlined.]