06/04/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 646 | |||
06/04/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
06/04/2011 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |||
06/04/2011 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |||
06/04/2011 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8177 | |||
04/07/2011 | File Number 488 | |||
04/07/2011 | House Calendar Number 287 | |||
04/07/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/07/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/23/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/22/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/03 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |