05/11/2011 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/11/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/11/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/10/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/04/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/12/2011 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/06/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/22/2011 | File Number 147 | |||
03/22/2011 | House Calendar Number 100 | |||
03/22/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/15/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |