06/02/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 597 | |||
06/02/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
06/01/2011 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | |||
06/01/2011 | House Passed | |||
03/22/2011 | File Number 149 | |||
03/22/2011 | House Calendar Number 102 | |||
03/22/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/22/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/10/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/10/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing |