|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Public Act 11-132
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
File Number 835
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 548
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 6154
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
File Number 151
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
House Calendar Number 104
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|