04/18/2011 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/18/2011 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/18/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/18/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/18/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/12/2011 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/04/2011 | File Number 357 | |||
04/04/2011 | House Calendar Number 212 | |||
04/04/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/28/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/11/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |||
03/11/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |||
03/08/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |