|
06/03/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Public Act 11-31
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Potential Disagreeing Action, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5971
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 334
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
File Number 324
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
House Calendar Number 197
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/03
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|