LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB06485
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB06485
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2011 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB06485
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 24, 2011
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
June 21, 2011
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
May 10, 2011
Compare
Bill
May 2, 2011
Compare
Bill
April 19, 2011
Compare
Bill
April 4, 2011
Compare