|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/21/2011
|
Public Act 11-135
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
File Number 874
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 616
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7992
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
File Number 344
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
House Calendar Number 215
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
|
03/02/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|